Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jasso, Mauricio, filed a(n) Nrs Chapters 78-89 case represented by Anthony P. Sgro, Rew R. Goodenow, against Jama Investment Group Inc, Maza-Noriega, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Denton, Mark R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDenton, Mark R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryNrs Chapters 78-89 |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 45 [45] Notice of Disassociation of Counsel |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Doc ID# 43 [43] Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Receiver |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry Doc ID# 44 [44] Notice of Entry of Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Receiver |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitution Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time on Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Receiver Court noted no opposition. Therefore, COURT ORDERED, Application GRANTED. Court directed Ms. Caprio to prepare a proposed order. Judge: Denton, Mark R. |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Audiovisual Transmission Equipment Appearance Request Doc ID# 41 [41] Audiovisual Transmission Equipment Appearance Request |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry Doc ID# 42 [42] Notice of Entry of Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time on Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Receiver |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Shortening Time Doc ID# 40 [40] Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time on Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Receiver |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Doc ID# 39 [39] Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Receiver |
|
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry Doc ID# 38 [38] Notice of Entry of Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Final Order Appointing Receiver |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Doc ID# 37 [37] Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Final Order Appointing Receiver |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.