Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Richardson-Smith, Wanda O., Smith, Eric, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Nathan Deaver, against Indian Hills Spe Corp, Realty Services Corp, represented by Jason D. Smith, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Hardy, Joe presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHardy, Joe Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial/Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial/Calendar Call
Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Settlement Documents Vacated Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Settlement Documents
Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order Doc ID# 36 [36] Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order for Dismissal with Prejudice |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice Doc ID# 35 [35] Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice |
|
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Vacated Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Check The Court inquired as to the status of the case and whether counsels were ready for trial. Mr. Crafton indicated to the Court that the matter has been resolved. Mr. Smith affirmed. Based on the information provided, COURT ORDERED, future hearings VACATED and SET matter for Status Check. 12/12/2022 09:00 AM STATUS CHECK: SETTLEMENT DOCUMENTS Judge: Hardy, Joe |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.