Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Arbitration Hearing | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice to Appear for Arbitration Hearing Amended Notice to Appear for Arbitration Hearing |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Discovery Order Amended Arbitration Discovery Order |
|
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Arbitration Discovery Order | |
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear for Arbitration Hearing | |
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Early Arbitration Conference Notice of EAC |
|
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Appointment of Arbitrator | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Chelsie Pridgett's Demand For Jury Trial |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure Chelsie Pridgett's Initial Fee Disclosure Form (NRS Chapter |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Defendant Chelsie Pridgett's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.