Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ninmer, Curtis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lawrence C. Hill, against Sharp, Robin J, represented by Michael L. Shirts, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Johnson, Susan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohnson, Susan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial/Calendar Call Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Trial Readiness Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice Stipulation and Order for Dismisssal of the Action with Prejudice |
|
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Scheduling and Trial Order Scheduling Order and Order Setting Civil Jury Trial |
|
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Rule 16 Conference Counsel appearing telephonically. Court reviewed the daily trial schedule with counsel and confirmed they would need 5-7 days for trial. Court further reviewed deadlines with counsel and asked Mr. Hill if he sent a demand for settlement. Mr. Hill stated he sent a demand the day before and said counsel have been in discussions. Ms. Smith confirmed that counsel have had a few conversations regarding settlement. COURT ORDERED, MATTER SET FOR TRIAL and advised counsel of the Judicial Settlement Conference Program. 3/17/21 8:30 AM STATUS CHECK: TRIAL READINESS 6/16/21 8:30 AM PRETRIAL/CALENDAR CALL 6/28/21 8:30 AM JURY TRIAL Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Rule 16 Conference Order Order Scheduling Mandatory Rule 16 Conference |
|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Joint Case Conference Report | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Commissioners Decision on Request for Exemption - Granted Commissioner's Decision on Request for Exemption - GRANTED |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.