Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedFebruary 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Settlement Documents
Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request Plaintiff's Request for Reinstatement Pursuant to E.D.C.R. 2.90(c) |
|
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Settlement Documents COURT FINDS after review that on August 10, 2020 a Notice of Change of Arbitration Hearing was filed. COURT FURTHER FINDS after review that on October 14, 2020, an ADR- Change of Status was filed. COURT FURTHER FINDS after review that on October 16, 2020, an ADR- Action Required was filed. COURT FURTHER FINDS after review that on October 19, 2020, the ADR Case Resolved in Arbitration. COURT FURTHER FINDS after review that on October 29, 2020, a Change of Address was filed. COURT FURTHER FINDS after review that a Status Check: Settlement Documents was set on December 22, 2020 on Chambers calendar. COURT FURTHER FINDS after review that Settlement Documents have not been filed. THEREFORE COURT ORDERS for good cause appearing and after review that the Status Check: Settlement Documents set on Chambers calendar on December 22, 2020 is hereby continued to February 16, 2021 on Chambers calendar. CONTINUED TO 2/16/2021 (CHABMERS) CLERK'S NOTE: This Minute Order was electronically served by Courtroom Clerk, Nicole McDevitt, to all registered parties for Odyssey File & Serve. /nm 12/23/2020 Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Settlement Documents
Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Hearing Vacated |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Change of Address NOTICE OF CHANGE OF MAILING ADDRESS |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
ADR - Action Required Action Required - settled |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arbitrators Bill for Fees and Costs Arbitrator's Bill for Fees and Costs |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
ADR - Change of Status Change of Status |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.