Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pacific Design Studio Llc, filed a(n) Other Business Court Matters case represented by Anthony B. Golden, against Element Building Company Llc, represented by Shea A. Backus, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Nancy L. Allf presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNancy L. Allf Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryOther Business Court Matters |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Settlement Documents
Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Vacated Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Vacated Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Vacated Judge: Allf, Nancy) VacatedDefendant Element Building Company LLC's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to NRCP 12(b)(5 |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order Vacated Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Doc ID# 150 [150] Notice of Settlement |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 149 [149] Clerk's Notice of Hearing |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Doc ID# 148 [148] Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5: Exclude Evidence of Non-Final Order From Pending Litigation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.