Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martinez Ortiz, Mirtha A., Lopez Hernandez, Jose L., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Matthew W. Hoffmann, against Ordway, Lucille Castro, represented by Mark L Gentile, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Johnson, Eric presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohnson, Eric Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - Case Closed Judge: Johnson, Eric |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - Case Closed Judge: Johnson, Eric |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Stipulation & Order for Dismissal Notice of Entry of Order |
|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document | |
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice | |
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Scheduling and Trial Order Order Setting Civil Jury Trial |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Scheduling Order | |
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Rule 16 Conference Mr. Bemis and Mr. Gentile appeared by phone via Blue Jeans. Court noted it had reviewed the Joint Case Conference Report, this case is involving a car accident, and the trial ready date is September 2021. Counsel concurred and agreed to the following dates: Complete Discovery on or before: 6/23/21 File Motions to Amend Pleadings or add parties on or before: 3/25/21 Initial Expert disclosures on or before: 3/25/21 Rebuttal Expert disclosures on or before: 4/23/21 File Dispositive motions on or before: 7/23/21 Following colloquy, COURT ORDERED, matter SET for trial. 8/18/21 8:30 AM CALENDAR CALL 9/7/21 1:00 PM JURY TRIAL Judge: Johnson, Eric |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.