Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nevada Sign, filed a(n) Other Civil Matters case represented by Sigal Chattah, against Pm Property Holdings Llc, represented by Craig D. Slater, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Silva, Cristina D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSilva, Cristina D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryOther Civil Matters |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Hearing Vacated |
|
August 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arbitrators Bill for Fees and Costs Arbitrator's Bill for Fees and Costs. |
|
August 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
ADR - Change of Status Change of Status |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Stipulation & Order for Dismissal Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order for Dismissal of All Claims Asserted in Complaint and Counter-Claim |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal of All Claims Asserted in Complaint and Counter-Claim | |
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Denying Motion for Declaratory Relief | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Order (03/10/20) The Status Check on the Order from the March 10, 2020, hearing came before this Court on its April 13, 2020, Chamber Calendar. Since the Order was signed and filed on April 15, 2020, COURT ORDERED, matter OFF CALENDAR. Judge: Silva, Cristina D.) Status Check: Order (03/10/20 |
|
April 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
List of Witnesses LTWT |
|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Arbitration Discovery Order. | |
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear for Arbitration Hearing. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.