Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kdlr Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Brian C. Whitaker, against Solutions Treatment Center Llc, American Addiction Center Inc, represented by Elizabeth Sorokac, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryOther Real Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Vacated Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial/Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Trial Readiness Vacated Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy Notice and Suggestion of Bankruptcy |
|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Bankruptcy Filing by American Addiction Center, Inc. and Solutions Treatment Center, LLC | |
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order to Convert Civil Jury Trial to Civil Bench Trial | |
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order to Convert Civil Jury Trial to Civil Bench Trial | |
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Scheduling and Trial Order Scheduling Order and Order Setting Civil Jury Trial |
|
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Demand for Jury Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.