Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Steadman, Patricia, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Jamie S. Cogburn, against Lowe'S Home Centers Llc, represented by Josh C. Aicklen, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Crystal Eller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCrystal Eller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - per Judge Judge: Roohani, Ellie |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - per Judge Judge: Roohani, Ellie |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference No parties present. COURT NOTED on February 4, 2022 parties filed a Stipulation and Order to Dismiss. COURT ORDERED, all future dates VACATED. CASE CLOSED. Judge: Roohani, Ellie |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Dismissal Doc ID# 30 [30] Stipulation and Order for Dismissal with Prejudice |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 11 From Judge Vacant, DC 11 to Judge Elham Roohani |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - Superseding Order Judge: Eller, Crystal |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - Superseding Order Judge: Eller, Crystal |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Eller, Crystal |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Eller, Crystal |
|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference Vacated - Superseding Order Judge: Eller, Crystal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.