Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brown, Catherine Annette, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against Nevada Employment Security Division Appeals, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Cory, Kenneth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCory, Kenneth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryOther Nevada State Agency Appeal |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal and Order Closing Case Order Granting Motion to Dismiss |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss DETR/ESD Amended Motion to Dismiss Petition for Judicial Review Counsel appeared via BlueJeans. Court NOTED the Petitioner was advised and provided the link to appear for this hearing and there is no appearance by the Petitioner. Motion having been duly filed and served, no opposition having been filed, pursuant to EDCR 2.20 and for good cause shown, COURT ORDERED, DETR/ESD Amended Motion to Dismiss Petition for Judicial Review GRANTED. Mr. Ward to prepare the Order, distribute a copy to all parties, and submit to Chambers within 10 days. All orders are to be submitted to dc1inbox@clarkcountycourts.us. Judge: Cory, Kenneth |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Certificate of Mailing Amended Certificate of Service (Clerk's Notice of Hearing) |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service (Clerk's Notice of Hearing) | |
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss Petition for Judicial Review | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Amended Motion to Dismiss Petition for Judicial Review |
|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Participate and Defend | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Brandon L. Phillips, Esq. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.