Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martinez, Pablo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by George Mark Albright, against Martin, Andres Dominguez, Harrington, Suave, represented by Michael L. Shirts, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Denton, Mark R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDenton, Mark R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order Granting Defendant Suave Harrington's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint as Time-Barred Under NRS 11.190 | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Vacated Judge: Denton, Mark R. |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Order Granting Defendant Suave Harrington's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint as Time-Barred Under NRS 11.190 |
|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Re: Defendant Harrington's Motion to Dismiss Complaint as Time-Barred by NRS 11.190 CAUSE APPEARING, there being no opposition, and pursuant to EDCR 2.20(e) and 2.23 (c), the Court GRANTS Defendant Harrington's Motion to Dismiss without oral argument and ORDERS such Motion removed from its civil motions calendar of July 6, 2020. Counsel for Defendant is directed to submit a proposed order. IT IS SO ORDERED. CLEK'S NOTE: This Minute Order was electronically served by Courtroom Clerk, Madalyn Kearney, to all registered parties for Odyssey File & Serve. /mk 7/1/20 Judge: Denton, Mark R. |
|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Defendant Harrington's Motion to Dismiss Complaint as Time-Barred by NRS 11.190 |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document and Curative Action Clerk's Notice of Curative Action |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document | |
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Three Day Notice of Intent to Default Three-day Notice of Intent to Default Defendant Suave Harrington |
|
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service on Defendant Suave Harrington |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.