Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ally Financial Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brian E. Holthus, against Herder, Luanda Nanette, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Johnson, Eric presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohnson, Eric Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryCollection Of Accounts |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeVoluntary Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition for Writ of Possession Vacated Judge: Johnson, Eric |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition for Writ of Possession Plaintiff Application for Writ of Possession & Show Cause Order Mr. Holthus advised Defendant is in the process of refinancing to obtain the funds to possibly resolve this matter and requested a two week continuance. Court thanked Mr. Holthus for contacting chambers and ORDERED, matter CONTINUED TWO (2) WEEKS. ... CONTINUED 2/12/20 8:30 AM Judge: Johnson, Eric |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Electronically Issued - Service Pending Summons |
|
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Application for Writ of Possession & Show Cause Order | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.