Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
West Charleston Lofts Iii Llc, Savwcl Iii Llc, filed a(n) Other Civil Matters case represented by John Michael Sacco, against Stacy L. Hertz Revocable Living Trust, Robert S. Richardson And Saundra Richardson Family Trust, Richardson, Robert, Paul L. Garcell And Pamela Hertz Revocable Living Trust, Patrick And Clara Carmen Dermody Family Trust, (total of 11) See All represented by Kenneth P White, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Bita Yeager presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBita Yeager Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryOther Civil Matters |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order The Court finds that Plaintiff has shown cause why its complaint was not timely filed pursuant to the Court s order to show cause and otherwise purged any contempt. The Court also extends the time for Defendants to file their response and counterclaim to January 31, 2023. CLERK'S NOTE: Counsel are to ensure a copy of the forgoing minute order is distributed to all interested parties; additionally, a copy of the foregoing minute order was distributed to the registered service recipients via Odyssey eFileNV E-Service (11-29-2022 ks). Judge: Gall, Maria |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing
Judge: Gall, Maria |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Doc ID# 90 [90] FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT |
|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Doc ID# 88 [88] Notice Of Intent To Appear By Simultaneous Audiovisual Transmission Equipment |
|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Complaint Doc ID# 89 [89] Complain for Declaratory Judgment |
|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Doc ID# 87 [87] Order to Show Cause |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order Doc ID# 86 [86] Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Gall, Maria |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Doc ID# 85 [85] Stipulation and Order |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Doc ID# 84 [84] Order to Show Cause |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.