Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Christopher E. Mumm, against Alcala, Dolores, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Wiese, Jerry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWiese, Jerry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryCollection Of Accounts |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment Plus Legal Interest |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 4 Reassigned From Judge Wiese - Dept 30 |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Wiese, Jerry A. |
|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Notice of Entry of Stipulation to Strike Order to Show Cause, and Withdraw Related Motion(s), with Prejudice |
|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Stipulation to Strike Order to Show Cause, and Withdraw Related Motion(s), With Prejudice |
|
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure (NRS Chapter 19) | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Response of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Order to Show Cause | |
December 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Amended Order Amended Ex-Parte Motion for Order to Show Cause and Amended Order to Show Cause |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING EXEMPTION AND RELEASING FUNDS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.