Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ashby, Mikanea, filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case against Romero, Diana, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Smith, Douglas E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSmith, Douglas E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 9 Judicial Reassignment to Department 9 - Judge Cristina Silva |
|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account The Status Check on Proof of Blocked Account came before this Court on the March 6, 2017, Chamber Calendar. Since sufficient proof of an established blocked account was filed on February 16, 2017, COURT ORDERED, matter OFF CALENDAR and CASE CLOSED. Judge: Smith, Douglas E. |
|
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Establishment of Blocked Trust Account Proof of Establishment of Blocked Account |
|
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Compromising Minors Claim Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Petition for Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.