Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hulliberger, Mary, Hulliberger, Kristopher, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Robert L. Rosenthal, against Nevada Property 1 Llc, represented by Lewis W Brandon, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Delaney, Kathleen E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDelaney, Kathleen E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order to Release Costs Bond(s) to Plaintiff | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order to Release Costs Bond(s) to Plaintiffs | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Settlement Documents Mr. Villamar appeared telephonically. COURT STATED it received notification the matter settled; a Stipulation and Order to Dismiss was not received therefore, the matter was still on calendar. Mr. Villamar stated the Stipulation and Order was signed 01/04/19. COURT SO NOTED, and ORDERED, matter OFF CALENDAR as DISMISSED. Judge: Delaney, Kathleen E. |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Stipulation & Order for Dismissal Notice of Entry of Order |
|
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice, Leaving No Remaining Parties | |
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Delaney, Kathleen E. |
|
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Pretrial/Calendar Call Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Delaney, Kathleen E. |
|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Having been advised by counsel that the parties have settled this matter, COURT ORDERS a Status Check for Settlement Documents SET January 15, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. If a fully-executed Stipulation and Order of Dismissal or other dispositive document is submitted at least one judicial day prior to the hearing, no appearances are required. CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was electronically served on registered parties. /sb 11/26/18 Judge: Delaney, Kathleen E. |
|
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order to Extend Discovery Deadlines and Trial Pursuant to EDCR 2.35 (Second Request) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.