Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Intouch Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dana J. Nitz, against Grant, Alfred, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Scotti, Richard F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScotti, Richard F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryOther Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal Pursuant To Nrcp 41 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice | |
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Status Check Ms. Habermas indicated the have drafted the application for default and have sent it to their client for review and to update the outstanding balance and anticipate filing by the end of November and requesting a prove up hearing. COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED to Chambers calendar to check for application and set for prove up. CONTINUED TO: 11/20/17 CHAMBERS Judge: Scotti, Richard F. |
|
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Status Check Default Judgment has not been submitted. COURT ORDERED, matter SET for oral hearing. 11/01/17 9:00 AM STATUS CHECK CLERK'S NOTE: This minute order was electronically served by Courtroom Clerk, Natalie Ortega, to all registered parties for Odyssey File & Serve. ndo/10/13/17 Judge: Scotti, Richard F. |
|
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Status Check Upon Court's inquiry, Mr. Jurani advised they have attempted to contact the Defendant and noted they will do a Default Judgment; COURT SO NOTED and ORDERED, status check SET on Chambers Calendar. 10/11/17 STATUS CHECK (CHAMBERS) Judge: Scotti, Richard F. |
|
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Scheduling Status Check | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Amended Order | |
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Order/Writ of Possession |
|
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Default | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default | |
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.