Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
First Sequoia Capital, Llc, filed a(n) Other Civil Filings (Petition) case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryOther Civil Filings (Petition) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Decision And Order | |
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Decision After review and consideration of the pleadings on filed herein and the argument of counsel at the time of the February 21, 2017 and March 6, 2017 hearings., COURT ORDERS, Petitioner's Petition on file here, and the same hereby is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE provided that any subsequent application seeking approval on the same or substantially similar terms shall disclose the Decision and Order to the Court. Counsel for Petitioner is directed to provide prompt written notice of entry hereof. Please see the Court's written Decision and Order filed March 14, 2017. Judge: Denton, Mark R. |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Decision and Order | |
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Hearing on Petition for Approval of the Proposed Transfer of Right to Receive Payments Pursuant to Structured Settlement | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing Sean Story, Esq., appeared on behalf of Petitioner Matthew R., Payee Court canvassed payee, Matthew R, on his need for the funds and his understanding of the process. Following his responses, COURT noted its concern with the attorney who originally handled the settlement receiving notice, and ORDERED, matter CONTINUED two (2) weeks for counsel to look into serving whoever comes out to be the successor of Mr. Mainor s firm and providing prompt notice to that firm and making sure that the record reflects said notice. CONTINUED TO: 03/06/17 9:00 AM Judge: Denton, Mark R. |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Petition For Approval Of The Proposed Transfer Of Right To Receive Payments Pursuant To Structured Settlement | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure (NRS Chapter 19) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.