Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bellagio Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Craig S. Newman, against Li, Ping, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Jones, David M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJones, David M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2016 |
CategoryCommercial Instrument |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment Plus Interest |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Prove Up Witness Michele Gatti sworn and testified. Exhibits presented. (See Worksheet). COURT ORDERED, Judgment GRANTED; Attorney fees AWARDED in the amount of $3,500.00 and stated Court will retain jurisdiction regarding any future attorney fees. Pre-Judgment interest shall accrue at the legal rate of interest. Judge: Jones, David M |
|
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Prove-Up Hearing | |
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Application for Default Judgment | |
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Default | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 29 Case reassigned from Judge Susan Scann Dept 29 |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Disclosure Statement Plaintiff's NRCP 7.1 Disclosure Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.