Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Herrero, Jessie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Joseph F. Schmitt, against Matthews, Brandon, represented by Robert L. Cardwell, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Johnson, Susan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohnson, Susan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment Upon Arbitration Award |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Doc ID# 20 [20] Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Examination of Judgment Debtor Vacated Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 19 [19] Notice of Entry of Order |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Doc ID# 18 [18] Order Granting Motion for Judgment Debtor Examination |
|
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion for Judgment Debtor Examination | |
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Having examined Plaintiff s Motion for Order Allowing Examination of Judgment Debtor filed May 8, 2018, noted the motion was served upon Defendant, no Opposition was filed thereto, and there is good cause therefore, COURT ORDERS Plaintiff s Motion for Order Allowing Examination of Judgment Debtor filed May 8, 2018 is GRANTED pursuant to EDCR 2.20(e). The matter scheduled to be heard Tuesday, June 12, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED pursuant to EDCR 2.23. Counsel is to prepare and submit a proposed Order to the Court within ten (10) days of this Minute Order or no later than Friday, June 8, 2018 pursuant to EDCR 7.21. CLERK'S NOTE: The above minute order has been distributed to counsel by the Judicial Executive Assistant, via electronic service, facsimile and/or mail. kc//5-29-18 Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Examination of Judgment Debtor Doc ID# 17 [17] Plaintiff's Motion for Order Allowing Examination of Judgment Debtor |
|
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Examination of Judgment Debtor Plaintiff's Motion for Order Allowing Examination of Judgment Debtor |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.