Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ally Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brian E. Holthus, against Wolkowicz, Mark Janusz, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Allf, Nancy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllf, Nancy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2016 |
CategoryCollection Of Accounts |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeVoluntary Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal without Prejudice | |
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Default | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Take Default Notice of Intent to Enter Default |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing Ms. Mead stated the Order to Show Cause was served on January 7, 2017, no attorney's have appeared on behalf of the Defendant and the Defendant has failed to pay for the vehicle. There being no opposition, COURT ORDERED, Writ of Possession is GRANTED. Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Order Regarding Writ of Possession (Without Undertaking) |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons & Proof of Service | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause (re writ of possession) | |
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Application for Writ of Possession and for Order to Show Cause Hearing | |
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Disclosure Statement Plaintiff's Disclosure Statement Pursuant to NRCP 7.1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.