Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Allison, Edward, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Pro Se, against Nevada Department Of Correction, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Thompson, Charles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThompson, Charles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2016 |
CategoryWrit Of Habeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 30 Pursuant to Administrative Order 22-09 - Case Reassigned from Judge Linda Marie Bell to Judge Jerry A. Wiese |
|
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 5 [5] Notice of Entry of Order |
|
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Decision and Order Doc ID# 4 [4] Decision and Order |
|
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Decision and Order | |
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus No parties present As the Plaintiff has previously been before the parole board, there is no additional relief this court may grant. COURT ORDERED, petition DENIED as MOOT.
Judge: Thompson, Charles |
|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Response Doc ID# 3 [3] Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus |
|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus | |
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order for Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Doc ID# 2 [2] Order for Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - AB510 |
|
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Order for Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - AB510 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.