Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sequoia Homeowners Association, filed a(n) Construction - Torts case represented by Paul P. Terry Jr, against Meritage Homes Of Nevada, Inc., represented by Raymond Babaian, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Williams, Timothy C. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, Timothy C. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryConstruction Defect |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeConstruction |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 31 Reassigned From Judge Scotti - Dept 2 |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 2 Construction Defect Case Reassignment to Judge Richard F. Scotti |
|
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Status Check Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Stipulation & Order for Dismissal Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order for Dismissal of Third-Party Defendant Reyburn Lawn & Landscape Designers, Inc. with Prejudice |
|
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice Stipulation and Order for Dismissal of Third-Party Defendant Reyburn Lawn & Landscape Designers, Inc. with Prejudice |
|
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order Granting Third-Party Defendant Reyburn Lawn & Landscape Designers. Inc.'s Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order Granting Third-Party Defendant Reyburn Lawn & Landscape Designers, Inc.'s Motion to Deem Settlement Agreement and Release Signed | |
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order Dismissing Meritage Homes of Nevada, Inc. with Prejudice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.