Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Flores, Araceli, filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case against Power, Kellie, Power, Frank, Allstate Insurance, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Order To Release Blocked Account Funds | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate Certification To The Court That Raul Hernandez III Has Reached Eighteen Years Of Age To Order The Release Of Blocked Account Funds |
|
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Proof filed on May 21, 2013, evidencing that blocked account in minor's name, Raul Hernandez III, was established; deposit in the amount of $1,479.26. COURT ORDERED, Status Check hearing set for June 6, 2013, is advanced and VACATED. CASE CLOSED. CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this Minute Order to be placed in the attorney folder(s) of: Eric O. Palacios (Palacios & Assoc). Judge: Bare, Rob |
|
May 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Establishment of Minor's Blocked Account | |
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account Order Approving Compromise of Claim of Minor Parties not present. COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED. CONTINUED: 6/6/13 9:00 AM Judge: Bare, Rob |
|
March 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account Vacated - On in Error Judge: Bare, Rob |
|
March 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Approving Compromise of Claim of Minor | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Petition to Compromise Claim of Minor |
|
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Opened |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.