Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hage, Michael A, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Travis N. Barrick, against Frabbiele, Timothy D, represented by Kenneth E. Goates, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Escobar, Adriana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEscobar, Adriana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 11 Reassigned From Judge Bell - Dept 7 |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 7 District Court Case Reassignment 2015 |
|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Escobar, Adriana |
|
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Escobar, Adriana |
|
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Escobar, Adriana |
|
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Escobar, Adriana |
|
October 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of order | |
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice Stipulation and Order to Dismiss with Prejudice |
|
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Civil Jury Trial Second Amended Order Setting Civil Jury Trial |
|
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order on Motion in Limine |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.