Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cml-Az Cornerstone, L.L.C., filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Nathan G. Kanute, against Orosel, Richard J., Orosel, Joann, represented by Martin I. Melendrez, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Earley, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEarley, Kerry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategoryForeign Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeSanctions |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Discovery Commissioners Report and Recommendations Discovery Commissioner's Report and Recommendations (Discovery Commissioner) |
|
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Richard J. Orosel and Joann Orosel, Defendants |
|
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Quincee Limited Partnership |
|
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Substitution of Counsel |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Discovery Commissioners Report and Recommendations Discovery Commissioner's Report and Recommendations |
|
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Compliance Vacated - per Commissioner Judge: Beecroft, Chris A., Jr. |
|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Compliance/Sanctions Mr. Blumberg having failed to appear and having failed to submit a timely and proper Report & Recommendation Pursuant to E.D.C.R. 7.21, from the 4/16/15 hearing, is herein sanctioned $250.00, payable to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada (Pro Bono Project) within 30 days. Submit proof of payment to ADR Discovery Commissioner. Further, this matter is set for a follow-up status check on 06/08/15 at 2:00 p.m. If the Report & Recommendation has not been submitted by that time, additional sanctions will be warranted. 06/08/15 2:00 p.m. Status Check: Report and Recommendations CLERK'S NOTE: The above minute order has been distributed to: Gordon Silver (Gabriel Blumberg, Esq.). ac/05/04/15. Judge: Beecroft, Chris A., Jr. |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Plaintiff CML-AZ Cornerstone, L.L.C.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Attendance at Depositions; and Motion for Sanctions Mr. Blumberg provided history of scheduled subpoenas, lack of production and subsequent proceedings. Upon inquiry of the Discovery Commissioner, Mr. Blumberg indicated personal service [of the subpoena] was affected on the Resident Agent for Quincee Limited Partnership, Mr. Dawson Further, Mr. Blumberg indicated Mr. Dawson produced the partnership agreement and informed counsel that his only function is to maintain the documents and control the filings. Further, the only production received was the partnership agreement and the key administrative trust. Colloquy regarding non-party to be compelled. Upon Court's inquiry regarding relief being sought, Ms. Miller indicated she represents Joann and Richard Orosel, individually; and, does not represent Quincee Limited Partnership. Court so noted. Colloquy. As to service of this motion, Mr. Blumberg indicated personal service was refused by Mr. Dawson's office. So, counsel mailed and emailed the motion to Mr. Dawson as Resident Agent to the entity. Colloquy regarding substance of the motion. COMMISSIONER RECOMMENDED, an order will issue compelling Quincee Limited Partnership to produce any and all documents relating to any and all distributions Quincee Limited Partnership has made, and to whom, since July of 2011; any all documents evidencing all properties in which Quincee Limited Partnership currently has an ownership interest; and, any and all documents evidencing all properties Quincee Limited Partnership had an ownership interest in since July 2011. FURTHER RECOMMENDED, production due No Later Than 05/06/15; and, if not produced, Discovery Commissioner will hold Quincee Limited Partnership in contempt of Court. Mr. Blumberg to prepare the Report and Recommendations, and Ms. Miller to approve as to form and content. A proper report must be timely submitted to ADR Discovery Commissioner within 10 days of the hearing. Otherwise, counsel will pay a contribution. Mr. Blumberg to appear at status check hearing to report on the Report and Recommendations. 05/04/15 2:00 p.m. Status Check: Compliance - Report and Recommendations Judge: Beecroft, Chris A., Jr. |
|
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Reply in Support Plaintiff CML-AZ Cornerstone, L.L.C.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Attendance at Deposition; and Motion for Sanctions |
|
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion to Compel Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Production Of Documents And Attendance At Deposition; And Motion For Sanction |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.