Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tristar Risk Management, filed a(n) Civil Petition For Judicial Review case represented by John P Lavery, against The Board For Administration Of The Subsequent Injury Account For Self-Insured, represented by Charles R. Zeh, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Williams, Timothy C. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, Timothy C. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategoryCivil Petition For Judicial Review |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Denying Judicial Review |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Denying Petition for Review and Affirming the Decision of the Board for Administration of the Subsequent Injury Account for Self-Insured Employers | |
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition for Judicial Review - Oral Argument Ms. Helmbold argued regarding the injury to the knee and timeline of subsequent injuries, and the notice regarding subsequent claims. Arguments regarding 2003 injury is a continuance of the 1993 injury. Further, there is no evidence that the form that is required to be sent to DIR, was not received. Further arguments. Mr. Zeh argued regarding the second notice and argued the C3 & C4 forms is notification of existing claims, not notification to the board. Each time there is a subsequent injury, there must be notice and there was never notice of the 2003 claim. Arguments regarding statute being amended. Colloquy regarding statute with potential jurisdictional nature. Colloquy regarding retroactively applying the statute, would mean the legislature would have to have put that in. Further arguments regarding the 100 day requirement, C3 & C4 forms and the notice in 1994. Further arguments. COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUE for CHAMBERS DECISION. Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Decision: Petitioner for Judicial Review After a review and consideration of the record, the points and authorities on file herein, and argument of counsel, Petitioner, Tristar Risk Management s Petition for Judicial Review is hereby DENIED. In this case, the thrust and scope of the dispute between the parties is whether the 2007 amendment to NRS 616.775(5), wherein the Legislature repealed the statute s 100-week notice requirement, constitutes a substantive or procedural right for the purposes of retroactive application. In Nevada, there is a general presumption that statutes operate prospectively, unless the Legislature clearly manifests an intent to apply the statute retroactively, or it clearly, strongly and imperatively appears that the Legislature s intent cannot be implemented in any other fashion. After a review of the legislative history, the Court finds no evidence that the Legislature intended to retroactively apply its repeal of the 100-week notification requirement under NRS 616.775(5), or any intent that all claims previously denied under this provision shall be revived by the amendment. COURT FINDS that Petitioner s employee sustained an industrial knee injury in April of 2003; however, Petitioner failed to send notification of this subsequent injury claim within the 100-week time limit mandated by NRS 616.775(5). Instead, Petitioner submitted an application for reimbursement for the 2003 injury in June of 2009 more than six years after the 2003 subsequent industrial injury occurred. Prior to the 2007 amendments, NRS 616.775(5) was silent as to whether the 100-week time limit for notification could be excused. Under Nevada law, where a statute is silent, the time period is generally considered to be mandatory, not procedural. See State Indus. Ins. System v. Partlow-Hursh, 101 Nev. 122 (1985). Therefore, the Court finds that the 100-week time limit required under the previous version of NRS 616.775(5) imposed a mandatory, substantive right. The Court also finds that the Board s interpretation of NRS 616B.557(5), as written and amended, and the Board s decision to deny Petitioner s application for reimbursement is supported by substantial evidence in the record on appeal and is neither arbitrary nor capricious. As such, the Board s decision shall be AFFIRMED and the Petition for Judicial Review is hereby DENIED. Counsel for Respondent shall prepare the Order, Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law in accordance with the Minute Order and the record in the instant action. MINUTES AMENDED TO INCLUDE CLERK'S NOTE: Minute order sent via email to nancy.helmbold@lewisbrisbois.com; crzeh@alo.com/stl/2/12/14 Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing for Oral Argument | |
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Stipulation to Extend Time for Respondents to File Answering Brief | |
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Answering Brief Respondents' Answering Brief |
|
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time for Respondents to File Answering Brief | |
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
June 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion for Order to Extend Time for Respondents to File Answering Brief |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.