Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bolten, Kimberly S., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Adam Kutner, against Cantan, Sheena K., represented by Deborah L Elsasser, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Scann, Susan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScann, Susan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2012 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeVoluntary Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change From Vacant DC8 to Judge Trevor L. Atkin Judge: ChangeFrom Vacant DC8 to Judge Trevor L. Atkin |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 8 Judicial Reassignment to Department 8 - Vacant DC8 Judge |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 9 Judicial Reassignment - From Judge Bailus to Vacant, DC9 |
|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 18 Reassigned From Judge Jones - Dept 29 |
|
January 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 29 Case reassigned from Judge Susan Scann Dept 29 |
|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Only | |
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Arbitration File | |
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Stipulation & Order for Dismissal Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order for Dismissal of Complaint, With Prejudice, Against Defendants Sheena K. Cantan, Aaron J. Proctor and Fox Rent A Car, Inc. |
|
April 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice Stipulation and Order for Dismissal of Complaint, With Prejudice, Against Defendants Sheena K. Cantan, Aaron J. Proctor and Fox Rent A Car |
|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Only |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.