Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carmelite Monastery Of Carmel, California, Inc., filed a(n) Other Tort case represented by David Lee Phillips, against Olson, Gregory R., represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Cadish, Elissa F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCadish, Elissa F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2012 |
CategoryOther Tort |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change To Judge Jacqueline M. Bluth Judge: ChangeTo Judge Jacqueline M. Bluth |
|
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order For Dismissal Without Prejudice Order Dismissing Case |
|
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion SPECIAL APPEARANCE AND EX-PARTE MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT, OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, AND FOR SUMMARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT GREGORY J. OLSON ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS GREGORY R. OLSON Judge: Cadish, Elissa F. |
|
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions Application for Default Judgment... Special Appearance and Ex-Parte Motion to Vacate Default, Opposition To Application For Default Judgment, and For Summary Dismissal Of Defendant Gregory J. Olson Erroneously Sued As Gregory R. Olson... Special Appearance And Ex-Parte Motion To Quash Service of Complaint Specially appearing Pro Bono on behalf of Defendant Olson, Michael Amador Esq. Mr. Amador stated he is specially appearing today and has no future responsibilities, or acceptance of service or anything like that. Court stated it' s not provided for under the rules. Mr. Amador advised he received paper work last night, was told to make an appearance, and he's aware of the filed motion. Court stated matters are calendared to take up whether to set aside the service of process and default. Mr. Amador stated he is only prepared for the first part of the motion. Court noted the lack of an opposition from the Plaintiff. Mr. Santos stated there is no opposition as service was not affected, although it was attempted many times and requested the case be dismissed without prejudice. COURT ORDERED, Motion to Quash Service and to Vacate Default entered against Gregory Olson GRANTED with the case of Mr. Olson being DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Mr. Santos stated he will prepare the order subject to the review of defense counsel. Mr. Amador stated he will review the order. Judge: Cadish, Elissa F. |
|
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion SPECIAL APPARANCE AND EX-PARTE MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF COMPLAINT Judge: Cadish, Elissa F. |
|
May 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Electronic Service Certificate of Service of Special Appearance and Ex-Parte Motion to Vacate Default, Opposition to Application for Default Judgment, and for Summary Dismissal of Defendant Gregory J. Olson, Erroneously Sued as Gregory R. Olson |
|
May 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion | |
May 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Electronic Service Certificate of Service of Special Appearance and Ex Parte Motion to Quash Service of Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.