Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gutierrez, Juan Manuel, filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case against Infinity, Cervantes, Rebecca, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Tao, Jerome T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTao, Jerome T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2012 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 16 Civil Case Reassignment to Judge Timothy C. Williams |
|
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Order to Disburse Funds From Compromise of Minors Claim | |
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Petition to Disburse Money From Compromise of Minors Claim | |
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 20 Case reassigned from Judge Jerome Tao Dept 20 |
|
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account Vacated - per Law Clerk Judge: Tao, Jerome T. |
|
March 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Law Clerk advised sufficient proof has been filed as to the Blocked Account. Therefore, COURT ORDERED, hearing date of 3/6/13 is VACATED as sufficient proof has been filed. JEA to notify the parties. CASE CLOSED. Judge: Tao, Jerome T. |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Establishment of Minor's Blocked Account | |
January 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Compromising Minors Claim Order Approving Compromise of Claim of Minor |
|
December 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Petition to Compromise Claim of Minor |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.