Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Marshall, Lorraine, Marshall, Clifton, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Cynthia D. Steel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia D. Steel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 1995 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Adult |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Guardian's Acknowledgment of Duties Report of the Guardian of the Adult Person |
|
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Compliance ROG | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Compliance Letter Mailed ROG |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Compliance Letter Mailed ROG |
|
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Report of the Guardian of the Adult Person April 1, 2019 through March 31, 2020 | |
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Report of the Guardian | |
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Status Check Vacated Judge: Potter, William |
|
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Domestic Notice to Statistically Close Case USJR - Guardianship Statistical Case Status |
|
July 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Report of the Guardian | |
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Mandatory Status Check Regarding Case Compliance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.