Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Teichmann, Kenneth, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Linda Marquis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLinda Marquis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 1995 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Adult |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department B Judicial Reassignment - From Judge Vincent Ochoa to Judge Linda Marquis |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department S Case reassigned from Judge Cynthia Dianne Steel Dept G |
|
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Domestic Notice to Statistically Close Case USJR- GUARDIANSHIP STATISTICAL CASE STATUS |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Status Check
Judge: O'Malley, Gloria |
|
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Domestic Notice to Statistically Close Case | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Administrative Reassignment to Department G | |
May 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassigned from Department H to Department E |
|
October 16, 1996 | Docket Event | Document Archive | |
October 16, 1996 | Docket Event | BOND (68531533) ($9,000.00) SCH/PER Date: Blackstone OC: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.