Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Darnold, Richard, Darnold, Julia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Gaston, Robert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGaston, Robert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 1995 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDivorce Granted |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disposal of Exhibits | |
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Petition and Order to Destroy / Dispose of Exhibits | |
March 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Document Archive | |
March 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certificate Clerk's Certificate |
|
March 21, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION AND ORDER SCH/PER Date: 03/21/2007 Blackstone OC: | |
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order STIPULATION AND ORDER SCH/PER Date: 03/12/2007 Blackstone OC: |
|
March 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted From Blackstone FURTHER PROCEEDINGS/REMAND Judge: Ritchie, T. Arthur, Jr. |
|
February 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing FURTHER PROCEEDINGS/REMAND SCH/PER Date: 03/07/2007 Blackstone OC: OC |
|
May 11, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL OF RECORD SCH/PER Date: 05/11/2006 Blackstone OC: GR | |
January 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion DEFT'S MOTION TO MODIFY CHILD CUSTODY Judge: Ritchie, T. Arthur, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.