Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Galano, Bonfilio, Galano, Amparo F, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Huffaker, Stephen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHuffaker, Stephen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 1990 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDivorce Granted |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Converted From Blackstone MINUTE ORDER RE: DISQUALIFICATION Judge: Christensen, Carl |
|
January 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassigned from Department B to Department R |
|
December 14, 1990 | Docket Event | DECREE OF DIVORCE SCH/PER Date: 12/14/1990 Blackstone OC: | |
December 13, 1990 | Docket Event |
Hearing MINUTE ORDER RE: DISQUALIFICATION SCH/PER Date: 12/13/2009 Blackstone OC: |
|
December 12, 1990 | Docket Event |
Converted From Blackstone MINUTE ORDER RE: RECUSAL Judge: Lehman, Jack |
|
December 12, 1990 | Docket Event |
Hearing MINUTE ORDER RE: RECUSAL SCH/PER Date: 12/12/1990 Blackstone OC: |
|
December 11, 1990 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DECREE OF DIVORCE Fee $114.00 SCH/PER Date: Blackstone OC: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.