Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Buchanan, Kathleen, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Cynthia D. Steel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia D. Steel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 08, 1991 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Adult |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department M Case reassigned from Judge Cynthia Dianne Steel Dept G |
|
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Final Discharge Final Discharge |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Adult Guardianship - Referral to Compliance Officer | |
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Settling Third and Final Account and Report of Guardian, Order Authorizing Payment of Fees and Order Terminating Guardianship | |
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Steel, Cynthia Dianne |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing of Third and Final Account and Report of Guardian, Petition for Payment of Fees and Petition for Termination of Guardianship |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.