Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ryan, Shawny, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Jackie Glass presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJackie Glass Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryCriminal Drug Court Petition |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 14 District Court Case Reassignment 2015 |
|
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 7 Case reassigned from Judge Delaney |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 25 Case reassigned from Judge Jackie Glass |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Specialty Court Reassignment Case reassigned from Judge Elliot to Judge Glass |
|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type TERMINATED FROM DRUG COURT |
|
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
BENCH WARRANT RETURN - DTP Court Clerk: CASSIE HALEY Heard By: Jennifer Elliott Petitioner in custody. Mr. DeJulio represented Petitioner's probation was revoked on January 7, 2009, in department #4. COURT ORDERED the following: 1) Petitioner TERMINATED from the drug court program. 2) Once released, Petitioner may request a 184 application for the RE-ENTRY PROGRAM. 3) CASE CLOSED. |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
BENCH WARRANT RETURN - DTP Court Clerk: Sandra Anderson Heard By: Lehman, Jack Petitioner present in custody. COURT NOTED the Petitioner has been remanded until her baby arrives. Mr. DeJulio stated the Petitioner has a revocation hearing set for 01/07/09. COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED. 01/09/09 9:00 AM STATUS CHECK - DTP CLERK'S NOTE: The wrong date was given out in open Court. A copy of this minute order has been placed in the Attorney folder of Doug DeJulio of the (Public Defenders Office) to serve as notification of the next hearing date. |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
BENCH WARRANT RETURN - DTP Court Clerk: Sandra Anderson Heard By: Lehman, Jack Petitioner present in custody. Mr. DeJulio stated the Petitioner has a revocation hearing set for 10/22/08. COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED. |
|
October 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
BENCH WARRANT RETURN - DTP Court Clerk: Sandra Anderson Heard By: Lehman, Jack Petitioner present in custody. Mr. DeJulio stated the Petitioner is being held on a probation violation with a notice of intent set for 10/07/08. The Petitioner also has a preliminary hearing set. COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED. |
|
October 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing BENCH WARRANT RETURN - DTP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.