Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nunez, Rafael, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Jackie Glass presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJackie Glass Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryCriminal Drug Court Petition |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 5 Reassigned From Judge Escobar - Dept 14 |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 14 District Court Case Reassignment 2015 |
|
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 7 Case reassigned from Judge Delaney |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 25 Case reassigned from Judge Jackie Glass |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Specialty Court Reassignment Case reassigned from Judge Elliot to Judge Glass |
|
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type BENCH WARRANT |
|
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type STATUS CHANGE: ACTIVE TO WARRANT |
|
August 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Bench Warrant NO BAIL BENCH WARRANT ISSUED |
|
August 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Drug Court Status Check STATUS CHECK: DRUG TREATMENT PROGRAM Court Clerk: ELAINE YORK Heard By: Terrance Marren Petitioner not present. COURT ORDERED, A BENCH WARRANT WILL ISSUE, NO BAIL. Fees waived while Petitioner is an absconder. Further, $30 FINE IMPOSED. |
|
July 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Drug Court Status Check STATUS CHECK: DRUG TREATMENT PROGRAM Court Clerk: ELAINE YORK Heard By: Jennifer Elliott Petitioner submitted essay as ordered in OPEN COURT. COURT REVIEWED Petitioner's participation in the program. Petitioner stated he attends two AA meeting weekly. COURT ADVISED Petitioner to keep up the good work and ORDERED, matter CONTINUED four weeks. 8/12/09 5:30 PM STATUS CHECK - DTP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.