Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
North Las Vegas City Of, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Gudiel, Obdulio, represented by Scott P. Eichhorn, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with David Barker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Barker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryCriminal Appeal - Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeConversion Judgment Event Type |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Remittitur to the Lower Court MUNICIPAL COURT REMITTITUR |
|
May 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
INITIAL APPEARANCE Court Clerk: Sharon Chun Reporter/Recorder: Richard Kangas Heard By: David Barker Counsel advised this has resolved, citing negotiations. Mr. Eichhorn represented that Deft Gudiel has paid fine, attended traffic school and victim impact class. Pursuant to negotiations, COURT ORDERED, the CHARGES of Safety Belt Use Requirements (M); Unlawful Poss License/Reg Knowing It is Fict (M); and Operation of Vehicle W/O Insurance (M), are DISMISSED. COURT FURTHER ORDERED, Deft SENTENCED to CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED (TWO DAYS)and CASE CLOSED. CASE CLOSED |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
INITIAL APPEARANCE Court Clerk: Dana Cooper Heard By: Villani, Michael Matter continued off the record. |
|
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
INITIAL APPEARANCE Court Clerk: Cheryl Case Reporter/Recorder: Bev Sigurnik Heard By: Cory, Ken Prior to Court, Mr. Eichhorn requested a continuance. COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED. |
|
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type SENTENCED ON CT 1 $1000 FINE $122 ADM $10 CF VIP 96 HRS CS TRAFFIC SCH DUISCH $60 CAF $40 CSF SUSP W/COND, CT 2 $25 FINE $32 ADM $10 CF, CT 3 $103 FINE $10 CFA $70 ADM $7, CT 4 $500 FINE $122 ADM $10 CF, CT 5 $1000 FINE $122 ADM $10 CF |
|
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Appeal from Lower Court MISDEMEANOR APPEAL Fee $0.00 |
|
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing INITIAL APPEARANCE |
|
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR DOCUMENTS AND NOTICE OF HEARING - STATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.