Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Nevada, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Winters, Kenneth D, represented by Craig Mueller, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Elizabeth Gonzalez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth Gonzalez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2007 |
CategoryCriminal Appeal - Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL AND REMANDING CASE TO JUSTICE COURT | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing ARGUMENT/DECISION Court Clerk: Kathy Klein Reporter/Recorder: Jill Hawkins Heard By: Elizabeth Gonzalez Colloquy regarding the 03/14/08 chambers ruling. At the request of Counsel, COURT ORDERED, matter REMANDED. |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss STATE'S MTN TO DISMISS APPEAL /3 Relief Clerk: Dana Cooper/dc Heard By: Michael Villani Arguments by counsel regarding motion. Court will consider matter and make a ruling by Tuesday 3-18. IN CHAMBERS RULING: Pursuant to NRS 189.010, the Deft must file a notice of appeal within 10 days from the time of rendition of the judgment. COURT FINDS that Deft timely filed notice of appeal, however, pursuant to NRS 189.065, Court must dismiss the Justice Court appeal if a hearing is not held within 60 days after notice of appeal is filed. Notwithstanding the fact that the Clerk of Justice Court failed to transfer the record to the District Court, the Petitioner had an affirmative duty to take appropriate action to have a hearing on the appeal set in the District Court within those 60 days. Petitioner did not have the matter set for hearing within the allotted time, therefore COURT ORDERED, State's Motion to Dismiss Appeal is hereby GRANTED. CLERK'S NOTE: Copy of this minute order placed in basket of Steven Waters (DISTRICT ATTORNEY CRIMINAL), and Craig Mueller, Esq (MUELLER, HINDS & ASSOCIATES)./dlc |
|
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply STATES REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO STATES MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL |
|
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL | |
February 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion STATE'S MTN TO DISMISS APPEAL /3 |
|
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Brief APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF |
|
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF COPY | |
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type ARGUMENT/DECISION |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
INITIAL APPEARANCE Court Clerk: Nora Pena Heard By: Jackie Glass Mr. Mueller requested to set a briefing schedule. COURT ORDERED, Briefing schedule set as follows: Mr. Mueller to file his opening brief 2/22nd, State to file response 3/21st, Mr. Mueller to file reply 4/4th and matter set for Argument and Decision on 4/11th in Department 11. 4/11/08 10:00 AM ARGUMENT AND DECISION (DC11) CLERK'S NOTE: There being no appearance by the State of Nevada on 1/28/08 copy of minute order left in Criminal District Attorney's bin for Mr. Steve Waters, DDA./np |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.