Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Estate Of Salvatore Crapanzano, Crapanzano, Sebastian, Crapanzano, Anthony, Crapanzano Jr, Salvatore, Amacio, Claire, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kristine K. Jensen, against Robinson, Tyson, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Sturman, Gloria presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSturman, Gloria Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order for dismissal of Defendant DTG Operations, Inc. |
|
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal of Defendant DTG Operations Inc. | |
January 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 26 Case reassigned from Judge Johnson, Susan |
|
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion for Prove Up Vacated - On in Error Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion for Prove Up At the request of counsel and there being no opposition, COURT ORDERED matter CONTINUED. CONTINUED TO: JANUARY 20, 2011 9:00 AM Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
November 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing on Prove Up on Plaintiff's Application for Judgment by Default | |
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion for Prove Up Notice of Prove-Up |
|
September 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Application for Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.