Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gulbrand, Carol, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Pro Se, against Parball Corporation, represented by Jeffrey I Pitegoff, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Smith, Douglas E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSmith, Douglas E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 9 Judicial Reassignment to Department 9 - Judge Cristina Silva |
|
February 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - Case Reassigned Judge: Bell, Linda Marie |
|
February 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Smith, Douglas E. |
|
February 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - Case Reassigned Judge: Bell, Linda Marie |
|
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - Case Closed Judge: Smith, Douglas E. |
|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice | |
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendant Parball Corporation's Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Answers Ms. Kindel stated parties reached a tentative agreement, and settlement documents are forthcoming. COMMISSIONER RECOMMENDED, matter CONTINUED. 1/20/10 9:00 A.M. Deft Parball Corp.'s Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Answers Judge: Bulla, Bonnie |
|
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendant parball Corporation's Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Answers |
|
October 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - per Commissioner Judge: Bell, Linda Marie |
|
October 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - per Commissioner Judge: Bell, Linda Marie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.