Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kulpa-Hauser, Jamie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Leon R. Symanski, against Diaz, Virginia, D T M Designs Inc, represented by Thomas H Peterson, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Delaney, Kathleen E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDelaney, Kathleen E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 29 Case reassigned from Judge Susan Scann Dept 29 |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 29 Case reassigned from Judge Kathleen E. Delaney |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Delaney, Kathleen E. |
|
March 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Delaney, Kathleen E. |
|
February 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Order to Statistically Close Case | |
November 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
October 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Jury Trial Order Resetting Jury Trial and Calendar Call |
|
September 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - per Judge Judge: Delaney, Kathleen E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.