Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ric'E, Percey L, filed a(n) Other Civil Filing case represented by Pro Se, against Patterson, Awo, Magnum, John Doe, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Elizabeth Gonzalez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth Gonzalez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryOther Civil Filing |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Order to Statistically Close Case | |
February 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
STATUS CHECK: Court Clerk: Kathy Klein Reporter/Recorder: Jill Hawkins Heard By: Elizabeth Gonzalez Mr. Percy Ric'e present by telephonic TTY relay. Also present by telephone is the Operator 6161 of the TTY relay system. Court noted Deft. is currently in custody at Southern Desert. Court inquired of the Deft. why no action was taken in this case for almost two years. No response from the Deft. Court noted it made its best effort to allow Deft. to appear telephonically to show why this case should not be dismissed and despite the presence of the operator of the TTY relay system, Deft. is unable to obtain a response. COURT ORDERED, Pursuant to EDCR 1.90B2, DISMISSES this case. Court noted Deft. failed to serve 180 days of the filing from 12/31/07. Court thanked the relay operator for her assistance. Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conversion Case Event Type STATUS CHECK: |
|
January 23, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT REASSIGNMENT ????????????PRO SEFC PRO SE???????????? | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SUPPORTING DECLARATION | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED Fee $0.00 | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certificate FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.