Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Frias, Elvira, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by J. Rusty Graf, against Las Vegas Hilton Hotel And Casino, Colony Resorts Lvh Acquisitions Llc, represented by Michael A Royal, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Villani, Michael presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVillani, Michael Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 18 Judicial Reassignment - From Judge Villani to Judge Holthus |
|
August 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order For Return of Monies on Default | |
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Order For Return Of Monies on Deposit | |
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Villani, Michael |
|
April 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Villani, Michael |
|
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Stipulation & Order for Dismissal Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order |
|
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice | |
December 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Vacating Deposition Notice vacating Depositionof PMK for LVI Environmental of Nevada, Inc. |
|
December 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Vacating Deposition Notice Vacating Deposition of PMK for Titan Interiors, LLC. |
|
December 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Vacating Deposition Notice Vacating Deposition of Allan Baxter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.