Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
United East India Company Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Aaron R. Maurice, against Liberty Realty Inc, Bell, Richard J, represented by Elizabeth S. Ashley, Sean K. Claggett, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Cadish, Elissa F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCadish, Elissa F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment Plus Legal Interest |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 9 Judicial Reassignment to Department 9 - Judge Cristina Silva |
|
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Sean K. Claggett's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel There being no opposition filed, COURT ORDERED, motion GRANTED. CLERK'S NOTE: The above minute order has been distributed to: Sean K. Claggett Esq. of Claggett and Associates. 11/12/09 kls Judge: Smith, Douglas E. |
|
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
September 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw As Counsel | |
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Renewal of Writ of Execution |
|
August 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Renewal of Writ of Execution |
|
August 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution | |
March 03, 2009 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION OF RICHARD J BELL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.