Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rudis, Timothy, Rudis, Kathleen, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Michael A Hagemeyer, against Bardo, Jeff, Alexander, Amanda, represented by Albert Orton Mitchell, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Smith, Douglas E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSmith, Douglas E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 9 Judicial Reassignment to Department 9 - Judge Cristina Silva |
|
May 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Arbitration File | |
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal | |
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Taking Deposition of Plaintiffs Timothy Rudis and Kathleen Rudis | |
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice to Take Deposition Notice of Taking Deposition of Plaintiffs Timothy Rudis and Kathleen Rudis |
|
June 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 8 Reassigned from Department 5 |
|
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Deposition Notice of Taking Deposition of Plaintiffs |
|
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury Trial | |
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Defendants Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.