Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ajax Bail Bonds, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case represented by Andrew M Leavitt, against North Las Vegas Justice Court, represented by Karen Lyons Van De Pol, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Jennifer P. Togliatti presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJennifer P. Togliatti Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryAppeal From Lower Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 1 Reassigned From Judge Israel - Dept 28 |
|
September 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 28 Reassigned From Judge Jennifer Togliatti - Dept 09 |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 9 District Court Case Reassignment 2015 |
|
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Remittitur to the Lower Court REMITTITUR |
|
September 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing ARGUMENT/DECISION RECORD ON APPEAL Court Clerk: Robin Mucciarone Relief Clerk: Louisa Garcia/lg Reporter/Recorder: Kristen Lunkwitz Heard By: Kathy Hardcastle Mr. Leavitt summarized the history of the case. Unilaterally the jail made a mistake because of stolen ID. North Las Vegas found Mr. Trevino and brought him into court and surrendered him. Mr. Leavitt advised this was a mutual mistake and everybody believed it was Mr. Trevino, and the bond company relied on those representations. Ms. Van De Pol advised to this day we do not know who this person is as there is no social security number but the birth date matches. Ms. Van De Pol noted this is extremely common. In this case we did not have a social security number to give, but we still have to go forward. COURT ORDERED, forfeiture AFFIRMED, matter REMANDED to North Las Vegas. Judge: Hardcastle, Kathy |
|
August 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply APPELLANTS REPLY TO STATES OPPOSITION TO APPELLANTS OPENNING BRIEF |
|
August 14, 2008 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULING ORDER | |
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response STATES RESPONSE TO APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF ON APPEAL |
|
August 06, 2008 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ORDER | |
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Brief APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.