Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gulino, Vincent, Gulino, Charles, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pro Se, against Vincent Gulino Special Needs Trust, Vannah, Robert D, Premier Trush Of Nevada Inc, Law Firm Of Vannah Costello Canepa Rie, Law Firm Of Jeffrey Burr And Assoc, (total of 11) See All represented by Robert D. Vannah, R. Gardner Jolley, John R. Mugan, Michelle Edwards, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Johnson, Susan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohnson, Susan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2007 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeSummary Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Department Reassignment | |
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 18 Reassigned From Judge Jones - Dept 29 |
|
January 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 29 Case reassigned from Judge Susan Scann Dept 29 |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 29 Case reassigned from Judge Kathleen E. Delaney |
|
November 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
September 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment BURRS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/5 Court Clerk: Michelle Jones Reporter/Recorder: Norma Ramirez Heard By: Susan Johnson Following statements by Mr. Gulino, COURT STATED FINDINGS AND ORDERED motion GRANTED. Court directed counsel to prepare the proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, pass it to the Pltf for review and submit it to the Court within 10 days or not later than September 12, 2008 pursuant to statute. Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
August 12, 2008 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO DEFT JEFFREY BURR AND THE LAW FIRM OF JEFFREY BURR AND ASSOCIATE LTDS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
July 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion BURRS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/5 |
|
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING DEFTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
June 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.