Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gaughan South Llc, filed a(n) Other Tort case represented by Barry L. Lieberman, against Tokhalyan, Asatur, Sahakyan, Rafayel, At & Rs Llc, represented by Hofland Beasley & Galliher, Troy A Baker, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Charles Thompson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles Thompson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2007 |
CategoryOther Tort |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeSatisfaction Of Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 2 Case reassigned from Judge Abbi Silver Dept 15 |
|
December 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT |
|
August 16, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING DEFENANTS MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Aside DEFTS MTN TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT/02 Relief Clerk: Phyllis Irby/pi Reporter/Recorder: Patricia Slattery Heard By: Joseph Bonaventure Mr. Hofland argued Deft's entered a default, but counsel must be given at least 3 days notice prior to Default Judgment. Mr. Lieberman advised Mr. Baker is no longer practicing law and not representing the Deft's. Mr. Lieberman further argued that if he had of just gotten a phone call from Mr. Baker saying he is not representing the Deft's that would have been fine. COURT ORDERED, do not see excusable neglect, therefore, COURT ORDERED, Motion is DENIED. Mr. Lieberman will prepare the Order. |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Aside DEFTS MTN TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT/02 Relief Clerk: Phyllis Irby/pi Reporter/Recorder: Patricia Slattery Heard By: Joseph Bonaventure There being no parties present, COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED. |
|
June 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply DEFTS REPLY TO PLTFS OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MTN TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT |
|
June 24, 2008 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF | |
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - GAUGHAN SOUTH LLC | |
June 04, 2008 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.